Moses v. Voith US Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracey Moses
Defendant: Voith US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00188
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611 Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Voith US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Voith GmbH & Co. KGaA for Voith US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tankle, Lee)
March 27, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Voith US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tankle, Lee)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time - On o before March 27, 2025, Defendant is required to answer, move, or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 2/24/2025 (cw)
February 21, 2025 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Voith US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Tankle, Lee)
February 4, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracey Moses. Voith US Inc. served on 2/4/2025, answer due 2/25/2025. (Abramson, Andrew)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 2/4/2025. (cw)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Voith US Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Voith US Inc. ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6886115), filed by Tracey Moses. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. Voith US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Moses
Represented By: Andrew S. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voith US Inc.
Represented By: Lee E Tankle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?