Gentex Corporation v. Sutter et al
Plaintiff: Gentex Corporation
Defendant: Brad Sutter, Patrick Walko, Simula Aerospace & Defense Group, Inc., Armor Holdings, Inc. and Specialty Defense Systems of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01269
Filed: July 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 295 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 295) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows:(1) Plaintiffs Motion for Defau lt Judgment against Defendants Brad Sutter and Patrick Walko is GRANTED. Judgment shall be entered in favor of the Plaintiff and against Sutter and Walko.(2) Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment against BAE Systems Aerospace & Defense Group Inc., BASE Systems AH Inc., and BAE Systems Specialty Defense Systems of Pennsylvania, Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/24/11 (jam, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs be able to obtain additional information from the ghost images and thumb drives as follows: (see Order for specific details). Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/13/09. (jam, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 142 Order. In my Memorandum Order of 10/19/09, the subject of the discovery of a summary was protected by the common interest privilege. In that Memorandum Order, I erroneously said the summary was "from Robert Mecredy of Armor to Joe Coltman of Simula the day before the merger agreement was signed" The summary in question was from Mr. Coltman to Mr. Mecredy and Ian Graham, Esquire, Armor's in-hourse counsel. The summary was prepared by Mr. Coltman and sen t to Mr. Mecredy and Mr. Craham. It is my view that the summary is privileged, and there has been no waiver of the privilege. See, SmithKline Beecham Corp. v. Apotex Corp., 232 F.R.D.467, 476 (E.D. Pa. 2005). Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/4/09. (jam, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Conclude privilege was not waived. Counsel for Gentex has raised an issue concerning a summary in which Gentex claims there was no common interest privilege. Gentex asked that I review the summary in camera to determine whether th e privilege applies. Since I have no response from Defendants on this issue, I will give them five (5) days to provide a response regarding the summary, after which I will determine whether to review it in camera. Otherwise, the motion for a protective order based on the Common Interest Privilege will be granted. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/19/09. (jam, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 63 MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Memorandum & Order, MOTION to Certify MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Memorandum & Order, filed by Armor Holdings, Inc., Simula Aerospace & Defense Group, Inc., Specialty Defense Sys tems of Pennsylvania, Inc. The Motion is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1. As to the request to stay further discovery on trade secret claims, the motion is DENIED. 2. As to the request for certification under 28 U.S.C. Section 129 2(b), the motions is DENIED. 3. As to the request that Plaintiff provide claimed damage information in discovery, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall provide damage discovery within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/23/09. (jam, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: disclosure of trade secrets and discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff may engage in discovery regarding the trade secret information it disclosed in its answers to Interrogatories 1, 6 and 7. 2. All discovery shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Case Management Orders in this case. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/25/08. (jam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentex Corporation v. Sutter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentex Corporation
Represented By: Donna A. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Walko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simula Aerospace & Defense Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Defense Systems of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?