Jayne v. Google Internet Search Engine Founders Featured Case

Plaintiff sued the founders of the Google internet search engine and alleged that his social security number when turned upside down is a scrambled code that spells the name Google.

Plaintiff: Dylan Stephen Jayne
Defendant: Google Internet Search Engine Founders
Case Number: 3:2007cv01677
Filed: September 18, 2007
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2008 23 Featured Case ORDER directing document 22 Request filed by Dylan Stephen Jayne to be stricken and filed in 3:07cv1113. (pltf used wrong lower Court case # and used C/A #07-4269 on document)Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/3/08. (sm, )
August 25, 2008 22 REQUEST for subpoenas by Dylan Stephen Jayne. (bg, )
February 29, 2008 21 MANDATE of USCA as to 11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dylan Stephen Jayne (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Clerk in reference to mandate, # 2 Court of Appeals Opinion)(Hernandez, Carmen)
November 5, 2007 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 18 MOTION to file exhibit(s) MOTION to file exhibit(s), 19 MOTION to file Ehibit(s) ("J" and "K") filed by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(ep, )
November 5, 2007 19 MOTION to file Ehibit(s) ("J" and "K") by Dylan Stephen Jayne. *NOTE: Pltf. Jayne filed a CD rom whose content is not known; cdrom forwarded to J.Munley's chambers w/ this document*(ep, )
November 5, 2007 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 20 Brief in Support, 18 MOTION to file exhibit(s) MOTION to file exhibit(s), 19 MOTION to file Ehibit(s) ("J" and "K"). Documents and Docket Sheet available through ECF. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ep, )
November 5, 2007 18 MOTION to file exhibit(s) ("I") by Dylan Stephen Jayne. *NOTE: Pltf. Jayne filed sheet of paper marked "Exhibit I" (attached h/w); also in envelope was a CD rom whose content is not known; cdrom forwarded to J.Munley's chambers w/ this document*(ep, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (ep, ). Modified on 11/5/2007 (ep, ).
October 24, 2007 17 USCA Case Number 07-4083 for 11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dylan Stephen Jayne. USCA Case Manager Carmen M. Hernandez (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF). (Hernandez, Carmen)
October 18, 2007 16 MOTION to Expedite all Motions by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
October 18, 2007 15 Document Filed entitled "Facts to retrieve documents". (bg, )
October 18, 2007 14 MOTION to retrieve documents by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
October 18, 2007 13 MOTION to file Exhibits by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
October 18, 2007 12 MOTION to Expedite Appeal by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
October 18, 2007 (Doc. 13) Motion to file Exhibits, was only filed with page 1 of Exhibit "H". Exhibit(s) were not provided. (bg, )
October 18, 2007 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL in Non-Prisoner Case as to 10 Order Dismissing Case, Order Granting Application to Proceed IFP by Dylan Stephen Jayne. Filing Fee and Docket Fee Not Paid. Filing fee $ 0.00 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (bg, )
September 27, 2007 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM and ORDER Granting Application to Proceed IFP; and DISMISSING case Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 9/27/07. (sm, )
September 18, 2007 9 MOTION to Expedite payment from Defendant by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 8 MOTION to Expedite Case by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 7 MOTION to Expedite filing of exhibits by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 6 MOTION to file exhibits by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 5 MOTION to Expedite Summary Judgment Motion by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 4 MOTION to Expedite Summary Judgment Order by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dylan Stephen Jayne.(bg, )
September 18, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Google Internet Search Engine Founders, filed by Dylan Stephen Jayne. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit(s))(bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jayne v. Google Internet Search Engine Founders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Internet Search Engine Founders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Stephen Jayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?