Keslosky v. Borough of Old Forge et al
Plaintiff: Michael B. Keslosky, III
Defendant: Borough of Old Forge, Borough of Old Forge Council, Borough of Old Forge Police Department, Lawrence A. Semenza, Anthony J. Torquato, Jr., David Scarnato, James J. Peperno, Jr., Alan Heyen, Shirley Helbing, James P. Minella, Old Forge Borough Civil Service Commission and Old Forge Borough Police Officers' Association
Case Number: 3:2008cv01240
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER denying 287 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 288 Motion for New Trial, for the reasons set forth in this Court's accompanying memorandum opinion. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/18/21 (jam)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER THAT Defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as follows: 1. Defendant's motion to preclude testimony regarding the settlement of civil action Kes/osky v. Old Forge Borough, et al. (3:93-cv-1751) is DEFERRED pending a hearing on the issues outlined by the Court in the accompanying memorandum opinion. A hearing on Defendant's first motion in limine shall be held on Monday, September 28, 2015, following jury selection and prior to the parties' opening sta tements. 2. Defendant's motion to preclude evidence regarding lost wages after September 10, 2004 is GRAN"rED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: a. Plaintiff will not be permitted to offer any evidence to support aclaim of lost wages which would h ave derived from work as a police officer at any time after June 30, 1999. b. Plaintiff may attempt to introduce evidence to support aclaim for lost wages as of the date of his request to return to work following the completion of his military servic e in August, 2004, for any non-police officer position as to which he can establish he was qualified to perform in accordance with 38 U.S.C. § 4313{a){4). 3.Defendant's motion to preclude testimony regarding the criminal convictions of Lawrence Semenza and James Krenitsky is GRANTED. 4. Defendant shall file of record the 1997 settlement agreement from civil action 3:93cv-1751 on or before Monday, September 21,2015.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/28/15. (jfg)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER upon consideration of Third-Party Defendant Municipal Police Officers' Education and Training Commission's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 101) and all accompanying briefs, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT MPOETC's motion is GRANTED.Judgment is HEREBY accordingly entered IN FAVOR OF THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT MPOETC and AGAINST DEFENDANTCROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF, theBorough of Old Forge.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/11/14. (jfg)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM and ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 18 26 MOTIONS to Dismiss; GRANTED re pltf's claims againstt individual dfts in their official capacities; GRANTED re Borough of Old Forge Council, Borough of OF Police Dept, Borough of OF Civil Service Commision; GRANTED re pltf's punitive claims against the Borough of Old Forge; GRANTED re due process claims; DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 8/25/09. (sm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keslosky v. Borough of Old Forge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Keslosky, III
Represented By: Scott E. Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Old Forge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Old Forge Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Old Forge Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence A. Semenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Torquato, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Scarnato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Peperno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Heyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Helbing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Minella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Forge Borough Civil Service Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Forge Borough Police Officers' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?