Reisinger v. City of Wilkes Barre et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Reisinger
Defendant: City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk, Michael Kermec and The Cradle Company II, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00210
Filed: February 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Unassigned2
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER of USCA as to 85 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Joseph R. Reisinger,DISMISSING case pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR Misc. 107.2 for failure to timely file case opening documents. (Hicks, Carolyn)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER of USCA as to 85 Notice of Appeal, filed by Joseph R. Reisinger, Clerk's Order Amending Case Caption. (Hicks, Carolyn)
March 1, 2011 Filing 86 USCA Case Number 11-1519 for 85 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Joseph R. Reisinger. USCA Case Manager Carolyn (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF). (King, James)
February 24, 2011 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEAL in Non-Prisoner Pro Se Case as to 76 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 84 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations,,,, 77 Order, by Joseph R. Reisinger. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0314-2110831. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: # 1 Court's 1/26/11 Order, # 2 Court First 12/8/10 Order, # 3 Court's Second 12/8/10 Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER 1. The Magistrate Judge's Report & Recommnedation (Doc.83) is Adopted. 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, filed pursuant to Fed.R.C.P. 41(a)(2) to Allow the Plaintiff to Make Judge Conaboy's Orders of December 8, 2010, Fianl Orders, for Purposes of Permitting an Immediate Appeal os Same (Doc.81) is Granted. 3. Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 action is dismissed with prejudice. 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 1/26/11 (cc, )
January 11, 2011 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Take NOTICE that in light of the R&R filed in this action, the case management conference previously scheduled for 1/13/2011 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Carlson is CANCELLED. (kjn )
January 7, 2011 Filing 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Joseph R. Reisinger - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs motion to dismiss the complaint with prejudice (Doc. 81) be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 7, 2011. (kjn )
January 6, 2011 Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Gregory Barrouk, City of Wilkes Barre, Francis Katz, Thomas Leighton. (Campenni, Thomas)
January 6, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. Joint case management plan due on or before 1/6/2011. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 16, 2010. (kjn )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson; for Pretrial Management; Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 12/8/10. (kn, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that: 1) The case originally docketed at 3:09CV210 filed on 2/2/10 should not be considered with the other actions consolidated by Order of 10/22/10 and will be considered separately under docket number 3:09CV210; 2) The cases originally docket number 3:09CV210; 2) The cases origiinally docketed at 3:10CV2005, 3:10CV207 and 3:10CV2111 are consolidated into 3:10CV2005; Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 12/8/10. (kn, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that: the court's 8/16/10 Ordor and 8/17/10 Order is DENIED; Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 12/8/10. (kn, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference in this consolidated action will be held on Wednesday, December 7, 2010, at 11:00 a.. in Scranton, Pa. Status Conference set for 12/8/2010 11:00 AM before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 11/4/10. (cc, )
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER 1. All deadlines pending in this consolidated action are suspended until furhter order of Court; 2. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of an Additional Forty-Eight (48) Hours to File Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc.73) is Deemded Moot; 3. Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc.73) is Deemed Moot; 4.No furhter filings shall be accepted in this case without permission of Court; 5. Further order of the Court concerning the status and scheduling of this consolidation will issue. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 09-210 (cc, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Removal Complaint by Michael Simonson, Ted Kross, Joseph Rodano, Edward Pesotski, City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Francis Katz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brobst, Donald)
October 26, 2010 Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Responses in Opposition by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Certificate of Service)(Reisinger, Joseph)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff may file his response by Tuesday, October 26, 2010.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 10/25/10 (cc, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Responses in Opposition by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Certificate of Service)(Reisinger, Joseph)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER consolidating cases 10-2005, 10-2007, and 10-2111 into this case. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 10/22/2010. (rm, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time of Eleven days until October 25, 2010, to fiel a response to Defendants' brief in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 10/19/10 (cc, )
October 14, 2010 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion for Eleven (11) Days to File Response by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Certificate of Service, # 5 Proposed Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Have Ten (10) days to File a Response to Defendant's Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc.65) is Granted. 2. Plaintiff's reply brief is due on or before October 14, 2010. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 10/6/10 (cc, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit(s) A, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D)(Reisinger, Joseph)
September 17, 2010 Filing 64 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 52 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk.(Brobst, Donald)
September 13, 2010 Filing 63 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 52 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit(s) a, # 3 Exhibit(s) b, # 4 Exhibit(s) c, # 5 Exhibit(s) d, # 6 Exhibit(s) e, # 7 Exhibit(s) f, # 8 Exhibit(s) g, # 9 Exhibit(s) h, # 10 Exhibit(s) i, # 11 Exhibit(s) j, # 12 Exhibit(s) k)(Fogerty, Kevin)
September 1, 2010 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of of Service by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support, 52 MOTION for Reconsideration and Certificate of Non-Concurrence. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 61 EXHIBIT H by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 60 EXHIBIT G by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 59 EXHIBIT F by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 58 EXHIBIT E by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 57 EXHIBIT D by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 56 EXHIBIT C by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 55 EXHIBIT B by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 54 EXHIBIT A by Joseph R. Reisinger re 53 Brief in Support. (Reisinger, Joseph)
August 31, 2010 Filing 53 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 52 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Joseph R. Reisinger.(Reisinger, Joseph)
August 31, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION for Reconsideration by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Plaintiff's motions to compel (Docs. 45 & 47) are Denied. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 8/17/10 (cc, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 50 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:1.All discovery shall be completed on or before September 30, 2010, subject to the following conditions--a.during this extension period, the depositions of Plaintiff, Dawn McQuade, the realty employee to be identified by Plaintiff, and the secretary to be identified by Plaintiff are to be conducted along with any additional individuals identified during the taking of these depositions who have information relevant to this case; andb.Plaintiff is prohibited from taking the deposition of Defendants or any other individuals who had previously been disclosed by Defendants;2.All dispositive motions shall be filed on or before November 15, 2010;3.Plaintiffs expert report shall be supplied to Defendant on or before September 30, 2010;4.Defendants expert report shall be supplied to Plaintiff on or before October 31, 2010;5.Motions in Limine, if any, shall be filed on or before March 8, 2011;6.Pretrial memorandums, points for charge, written expert reports of expert witnesses scheduled to testify, and Special Verdict Questions shall be filed on or before March 17, 2011;7.A final pretrial conference will be held in this matter on Thursday, March 24, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers;8.This case is assigned to the April 2011 Trial List with Jury Selection to commence on Tuesday, April 4, 2011, at 9:30 a.m. in Scranton, Pennsylvania; Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2011 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2011 09:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 8/17/10. (cc, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER 1. City Defendants' Motion for Extension of time to Complete Discovery and to Amend the Amended Case Management Schedule (Doc.41) is Granted. 2. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File (i) Motions to Compel Productions of Documents, and (ii) a Response and Proposed Alternative Amended Case Management Plan in Opposition to City Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Amend the Amended Case Management Schedule (Doc.43) is Denied. 3. An Amended Case Management Schedule will be issued separately. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 8/16/10 (cc, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 48 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Reisinger, Joseph)
August 16, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
August 16, 2010 Filing 46 BRIEF IN SUPPORT and in Opposition to City Defendants' Motion To Amend Amended Case Management Plan re 45 Proposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Reisinger, Joseph)
August 16, 2010 Filing 45 Proposed MOTION to Compel Discovery by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
August 13, 2010 Filing 44 RESPONSE by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc. to 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extension to File Motions to Compel Production and a Response and Proposed Alternative Case Management Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fogerty, Kevin)
August 6, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extension to File Motions to Compel Production and a Response and Proposed Alternative Case Management Plan by Joseph R. Reisinger.(Reisinger, Joseph)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DEEMING WITHDRAWN 39 Motion Court Approval to Limit Pltf to Only Four Hours a Day; Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 07/27/10 (ep, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery And To Amend the Amended Case Management Schedule by City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brobst, Donald)
June 9, 2010 Filing 40 Exhibit A to Motion for Court Approval by Joseph R. Reisinger. 39 MOTION Court Approval to Limit Plaintiff to only Four Hours a Day. (Reisinger, Joseph)
June 9, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION Court Approval to Limit Plaintiff to only Four Hours a Day by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reisinger, Joseph)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER It Is Hereby Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Produce Expert Reports (Doc.37) is Denied as Moot.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 5/28/10 (cc, )
May 28, 2010 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Expert Reports by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence, # 3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Reisinger, Joseph)
May 27, 2010 Filing 36 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Produce Expert Reports (Doc.33) is Granted and the following Amended Schedule shall apply: Discovery by 6/30/10. Plaintiff's Expert Report due 7/12/10; Defendants' Expert Reports due 8/12/10. Motions in limine by 10/4/10. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2010 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Jury Selection set for 11/2/2010 09:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Motions due by 8/15/2010. Pretrial Memos due by 10/12/2010.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 5/27/10. (cc, )
May 25, 2010 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc. to 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Expert Reports. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(Fogerty, Kevin)
May 24, 2010 Filing 34 Proposed Order by Joseph R. Reisinger. 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Expert Reports. (Reisinger, Joseph)
May 24, 2010 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Expert Reports by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Reisinger, Joseph)
April 16, 2010 Filing 32 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Because Plaintiff's Motion to Request Amendment of Case Management Plan (Doc. 29) and the Motion fo Extension of time to Complete Discovery and to Amend the Case Management Schedule (Doc.30) filed by Defendants and because neither motion has concurrence of the opposing party/parties and because Plaintiff is no longer represented by counsel and is proceeding pro se the following Amended Schedule shall apply: Plaintiff's Expert Report due 5/30/10, Defendants' Expert Reports due 6/30/10, Motions in Limine due 10/4/10, Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2010 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Jury Selection set for 11/2/2010 09:30AM before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Discovery due by 6/30/2010. Motions due by 7/31/2010. Pretrial Memos due by 10/12/2010. This Order disposes of (Doc. 29) and (Doc. 30)Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 4/16/10. (cc, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 31 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Revised Case Management Plan filed by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit(s) a, # 3 Exhibit(s) b, # 4 Exhibit(s) c)(Fogerty, Kevin)
March 25, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Amend the Case Management Schedule by City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brobst, Donald)
March 25, 2010 SPECIAL ADMISSION AND ECF REGISTRATION FORMS SENT to Joseph Reisinger. (pjr)
March 24, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Revised Case Management Plan by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Reisinger, Joseph)
February 9, 2010 Filing 28 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time of Discovery and to File Dispositive Motions. Because Plaintiff filed a motion for enlargement of Time of discovery and to file dispositive motions on January 26, 2010 (Doc. 25); andBecause all parties do not agree on the Discovery Deadline extension proposed by Plaintiff (see Doc. 26); andBecause the deposition of Plaintiff on January 26, 2010, and the depositions of Dawn McQuaide, Ken Luck, John Popvich, Rose Ann Lesh, and Daniel Weber on January 28, 2010, could not take place due to an injury sustained by Plaintiff (see Doc. 25); andBecause discovery was scheduled to conclude on January 31, 2010 (Doc. 22); and Because the parties dispute the scope of discovery allowed in any extension (Doc. 26); andBecause certain extensions are necessary to facilitate the progress of this litigation,NOW, THEREFORE, THIS 9th DAY OF FEBRUARY 2010 THE FOLLOWING AMENDED SCHEDULE SHALL APPLY,1.As limited below, the Discovery Deadline is extended to no later than March 31, 2010;2.The Discovery Deadline extension is limited as follows: 1) during the extension period, the depositions of Plaintiff, Dawn McQuaide, Ken Luck, John Popovich, Rose Ann Lesh, and Daniel Weber, are to be conducted; and 2)the parties are allowed seven days following the final deposition to conduct discovery related to information obtained during the depositions specifically allowed by this Order;3.The Dispositive Motion Deadline is extended to May 31, 2010;4.Plaintiffs experts report will be supplied to Defendants on or before February 28, 2010;5.Defendants expert report will be supplied to Plaintiff on or before April 30, 2010;6.All other previously scheduled dates remain in effect. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 2/9/10 (cc, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 27 Plaintiff's REPLY BRIEF to the 26 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend discovery and dispositive motions for sixty days, filed by Pltf Joseph R. Reisinger. (Loftus, Peter)
January 27, 2010 Filing 26 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend discovery and dispositive motions for sixty days filed by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Fogerty, Kevin)
January 26, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend discovery and dispositive motions for sixty days by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence/Non-Concurrence, # 3 Exhibit A)(Loftus, Peter)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Motion Deadline and Expert Report Deadlines. Dispositive Motions deadline is March 20, 2010. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due January 31, 2010. Defendant's Expert reports due March 31, 2010. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 1/12/10 (cc, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend the Dispositive Motions and Expert Report Deadlines by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Concurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Loftus, Peter)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff's expert reports due 12/31/2009. Discovery due by 1/31/2010. Defendant's expert reports due 1/31/2010.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 11/3/09 (cc, )
October 30, 2009 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and file expert reports by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence, # 3 Certificate of Concurrence)(Loftus, Peter)
August 31, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Campenni on behalf of City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk. (Campenni, Thomas)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on the basis of the submissions of the parties (3:09-CV-210 Docs. 18, 19, 3:09-CV-1554 Docs.12 & 16) in response to the Court's Order to Show Cause regarding consolidation issued on August 19, 2009, (3:09-CV-210 Doc. 15; 3:09-Cv-1554), the above captioned cases will not be consolidated.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 8/28/09. (cc, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 18 Answer to Rule to Show Cause by Joseph R. Reisinger. 15 Order to Show Cause,. (Loftus, Peter)
August 27, 2009 Filing 17 REPLY by City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk. to 15 Order to Show Cause,. (Brobst, Donald)
August 25, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Aciukewicz on behalf of City of Wilkes Barre. (Aciukewicz, John)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE the Parties are directed to Show Cause on or before Augsut 27, 2009, why these actions should not be consolidated and/or hwy said consolidation should not take place on August 28, 2009. Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2009.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 8/19/09. (cc, )
April 24, 2009 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: As a result of a Case Management Conference held on April 23, 2009, the following schedule shall apply to this matter: This case is assigned to the September 2010, Trial List, with jury selection to commence on Tuesday, September 7, 2010, at 9:30 a.m. in Scranton, Pa. Plaintiff's Expert Report due 10/31/09. Defendant's Expert Report due 11/30/09. Counsel to notify the Court by 12/3/09, regarding the status of settlement. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2010 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2009. Discovery due by 11/30/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2009. Motions due by 1/20/2010. Pretrial Memos due by 8/11/2010.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 4/24/09. (cc, )
April 21, 2009 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Loftus, Peter)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Case Management Conference will be conducted by the Court on 4/23/2009, at 10:00 AM ( via telephone conference) before Honorable Richard P. Conaboy.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 4/7/09. (cc, )
April 3, 2009 Filing 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk.(Brobst, Donald)
March 23, 2009 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc.. (Fogerty, Kevin)
March 19, 2009 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Kevin T. Fogerty. (jc)
March 18, 2009 Filing 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc..(Fogerty, Kevin)
March 18, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Fogerty on behalf of Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc. (Fogerty, Kevin)
March 11, 2009 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Thomas Leighton. Thomas Leighton waiver sent on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (Loftus, Peter)
March 11, 2009 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Joseph R. Reisinger. Frances Kratz waiver sent on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (Loftus, Peter)
March 11, 2009 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Joseph R. Reisinger. City of Wilkes Barre waiver sent on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (Loftus, Peter)
March 11, 2009 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Joseph R. Reisinger. Gregory Barrouk waiver sent on 2/5/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (Loftus, Peter)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures this case is assigned to the September 14, 2009, Trial List. General instructions to counsel.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 2/5/09. (cc, )
February 5, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Conaboy. (kn, )
February 2, 2009 Summons Issued as to City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk, Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc. and provided to Atty Loftus for service on Defendants. (rm, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Wilkes Barre, Thomas Leighton, Frances Kratz, Gregory Barrouk, Michael Kermec, The Cradle Company II, Inc., filed by Joseph R. Reisinger. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reisinger v. City of Wilkes Barre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Reisinger
Represented By: Peter G. Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilkes Barre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Barrouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kermec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cradle Company II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?