Sabric et al v. Lockheed Martin et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Sabric and Genevieve Sabric
Defendant: Lockheed Martin and U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02237
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry), ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant U.S. Security Associates Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 46) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Lockheed Martins Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 37) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (1) Lockheed Martins Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs claims is GRANTED. (2) Lockheed Martins Motion for Summary Judgment on its cross-claim for indemnification and reimbursement against U.S. Security Associates, Inc. is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark the case as CLOSED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/30/12. (jam, )
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 30 Letter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant U.S. Security Associates, Inc.'s motion for a protective order as to the investigation of Joseph Gill is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/23/11. (jam, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT within 10 days Defendant submit to the Court Ms. Evan's internal report into the 12/16/08 shooting for in camera review. After any necessary redactions are made by the Court, the Defendant will make the report available to the Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/23/11. (jam, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Defendant Lockheed Martin's Motion For a More Definite Statement, to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, and to Strike (Doc. 5) is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part, as follows: a) Defendant Lockheed Martin's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. b) Defendant Lockheed Martin's Motion for a More Definite Statement is DENIED. c) Defendant Lockheed Martin's Motion to Strike Paragraph 61(e) of the Complaint is GRANTED. (2) Defendant U.S. Security's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/12/10 (jam, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 2 Motion to Remand. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. 2) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/10/10 (jam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabric et al v. Lockheed Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sabric
Represented By: Sal Cognetti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Sabric
Represented By: Sal Cognetti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin
Represented By: Joseph F. McNulty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jay L. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?