Rivera v. Rendell et al
Plaintiff: Roberto C Rivera
Defendant: Ed Rendell, Jeffrey Beard, James C Barnacle, Mark L Dembert, John Johnson, Dorina Varner, Shirley R Moore Smeal, Mark D. Goldberg, Andrea Priori Meintel, Kathy Zwierzyna, Richard S. Ellers, Michael D. Klopotoski, Norman Demming, Vincent Mooney, Jerome Walsh, Robin Lucas, Thomas Leskowski, Oludolapo Kale, Mahich, Wittywat, Buffton, Andrew Loluhoski, Jane Mary Jesse, Ellen Lucas, Michael Goyne, Thomas Sokaloski and McKeown
Case Number: 3:2010cv00505
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Presiding Judge: PT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry).(1) The Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 245) filed by Defendant Jerome Walsh is GRANTED.(2) Judgment is ENTERED in FAVOR of Defendant Walsh and AGAINST Plaintiff Roberto C. Rivera on the sole remaining claim in this action, i.e.,Plaintiffs claim that Defendant Walsh was deliberately indifferent to hisserious mental health needs in March 2009 when failing to reinstate hisZ Code status. (3) The Clerk of Court is directed to mark the case as CLOSED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/2/18. (dw)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 234 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Roberto C Rivera, 231 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Roberto C Rivera.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/12/17. (jam)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER denying 225 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/12/17 (ep)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 202 MOTION for Order filed by Roberto C Rivera, 200 MOTION for Order filed by Roberto C Rivera, 198 MOTION for Discovery filed by Roberto C Rivera. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/16/17. (jam)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 172 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Roberto C Rivera. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/3/15. (jam)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 188 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Roberto C Rivera.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/2/15. (jam)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Oludolapo Kale, 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Loluhoski, Thomas Sokaloski, Jerome Walsh, Michael Goyne, 149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed filed by Roberto C Rivera, 150 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Roberto C Rivera. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/21/15. (jam)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/5/13 (jam)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 70 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Roberto C Rivera, 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Jane Mary Jesse, Oludolapo Kale, 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael D. Klopotoski, Vincent Mooney, Dorina Varner, Thomas Leskowski, Richard S. Ellers, McKeown, Michael Goyne, Mark L Dembert, Shirley R Moore Smeal, Norman Demming, Ed Rendell, Andrea Priori Meintel, Jerome Walsh, Andrew Loluhoski, Robin Lucas, John Johnson, Kathy Zwierzyna, Thomas Sokaloski, Jeffrey Beard, James C Barnacle, Mark D. Goldberg. It is ORDERED that:1.The Commonwealth Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 13) is GRANTED.2.All supervisory liability claims against defendants Rendell, Beard, Moore-Smeal, Goldberg, Barnacle, Dembert, Prior-Meintel, Johnson, Ellers, Zwierzyna, Varner, Klopotoski, Demming, Mooney, Lucas, and Leskowsky are DISMISSED.3.All due process claims against defendants Moore-Smeal, Goldberg , Prior-Meintel and McKeown are DISMISSED.4.Commonwealth Defendants Walsh, Goyne, Lopuhovsky and Sokaloski are granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file an Answer to the Complaint.5.The Medical Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc . 15) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.6.The Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claims against Dr. Jesse are DISMISSED.7.The motion to dismiss the Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claims against Dr. Kale is DENIED.8.Dr. Kale is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file an Answer to the Complaint.9.Mr. Riveras Motion to Amend the Complaint (Doc. 70) is DENIED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/1/13. (jam)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without prejudice. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/27/13 (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Rendell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto C Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Rendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Barnacle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L Dembert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorina Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley R Moore Smeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Priori Meintel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Zwierzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Ellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Klopotoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Demming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Leskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oludolapo Kale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wittywat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Loluhoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Mary Jesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sokaloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?