Hill v. Lappin et al
Petitioner: Ernest Jack Hill, III
Respondent: Harley G. Lappin and Ronnie Holt
Case Number: 3:2010cv01743
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson; 1) The October 12, 2012 Report and Recommendation 172 of Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson is adopted, as outlined in the attached memorandum; 2) Defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment 137 is granted, in part and denied in part; and 3) This case is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum of Order. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 1/17/13. (ts)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, Hills discovery motions, (Docs. 104, 110, 111, 112, 114), and motion for sanctions (Doc. 131) are DENIED. Hills Second Motion for Extension of Time in which to File a Reply Brief, (Doc. 143), which was previously granted by this Court, (Doc. 141), is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 6, 2012. (kjn )
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration (Doc. 52 ), and motion to file a brief in support of Plaintiffs motion for judicial notice (Doc. 53 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 16, 2011. (kjn )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before September 10, 2010. Any amended complaint shall be complete in all respects, and should address the issues raised by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 25, 2010. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Lappin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Jack Hill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harley G. Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronnie Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?