Brown v. Camp Hill et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Brown
Defendant: Camp Hill, Central Office Executive Staff, William D. Sprenkle, Mardiann I Vincent, Tanya Brandt, Michael D. Klopotoski, Vincent Mooney, Jerome Walsh, Robin Lucas, Norm Demming, Galen Miller, Peter Cwalina, Daniell Zielen, Lori Lyons and Mike Truchon
Case Number: 3:2010cv02612
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: PT
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/27/19. (ao)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 126 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants are to file the additional Motion for Summary Judgment and accompanying briefs and exhibits within 45 days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/16/2018 (bg)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/5/2017 (bg)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 75 MOTION for Order filed by Charles Edward Brown, 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William D. Sprenkle, Lori Lyons, Tanya Brandt, Michael D. Klopotoski, Jerome Walsh, Vincent Mooney.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/29/16. (jam)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 33 MOTION EQUITABLE TOLLING TO EXHAUST PRISON ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES filed by Charles Edward Brown, 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William D. Sprenkle, Daniell Zielen, Galen Miller, Lori Lyons, Mardiann I Vincent, Michael D. Klopotoski, Peter Cwalina, Jerome Walsh, Norm Demming, Vincent Mooney, Robin Lucas, Mike Truchon, Tanya Brandt. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/25/15. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Camp Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Office Executive Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Sprenkle
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardiann I Vincent
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Brandt
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Klopotoski
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Mooney
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Walsh
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Lucas
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norm Demming
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen Miller
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Cwalina
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniell Zielen
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lyons
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Truchon
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?