FRAZIER v. COLLINS et al
Petitioner: Vincent Frazier
Respondent: Collins, The district attorney for the county of monroe and The Attorney General for the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2011cv00019
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: DB
Presiding Judge: William J. Nealon
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William J. Nealon on 11/22/13. (ts)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Petitioner is granted twenty (20) days from the date of this order to shwo cause why his peition should not be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. 2. Respondents are granted fifteen (15) days from the date of Frazier's response to file a reply.Signed by Honorable William J. Nealon on 6/20/2013. (cw)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HART IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS TO THE UNITED STATES COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. THERE IS NO BASIS FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 01/3/11. 1/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (COPY TO PRO SE)(lvj, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/4/2011.]
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BE TRANSFERRED TO THE USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. THERE HAS BEEN NO SUBSTANTIAL SHOWINGOF THE DENIAL OF A CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHT REGUIRING THE ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 12/8/10. 12/09/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(COPY TO PRO SE)(lvj, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/4/2011.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRAZIER v. COLLINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The district attorney for the county of monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General for the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?