ASD Specialty Healthcare Inc. v. New Life Home Care Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ASD Specialty Healthcare Inc.
Defendant: New Life Home Care Inc. and Gregory Malia
Case Number: 3:2011cv00068
Filed: January 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) that the defts' motion to vacate judgment is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/22/13. (bs)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM re 70 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Request for Sanctions for Defendants' Failure to Comply with Court Orders filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare Inc. (order to follow).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/10/13. (bs)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM re 41 MOTION for Default Judgment as to the claims against New Life Home Care, Inc. based on the Court's October 21, 2011 Order filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare Inc. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/1/12. (jam, )
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1. Defendant Gregory Malias motion to dismiss the amended complaint is DENIED.2. Pla intiff has failed to properly serve Defendant Gregory Malia. Plaintiff must perfect service within twenty-one (21) days of this order.3. Plaintiffs motion to dismiss Defendant New Life Home Care Inc.s counterclaims is GRANTED in part and DENIED in p art. Counts I and III alleging fraudulent concealment and fraud, misrepresentation and deceit are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant is granted leave to amend in order to specify timely fraud allegations and/or allege with particularity any price inflation fraud claims. Defendant has twenty-one (21) days to amend or the claims will be dismissed with prejudice.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/29/11 (jam, )
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, the plaintiff may file and amended complaint. 2. The plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/19/2011. (cw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASD Specialty Healthcare Inc. v. New Life Home Care Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASD Specialty Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Morton R. Branzburg
Represented By: William R. Hinchman
Represented By: Patrick J. Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Life Home Care Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Malia
Represented By: Bruce Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?