Ponzini et al v. Monroe County et al
Plaintiff: Peter Ponzini and Miryem Barbaros
Defendant: Monroe County, Monroe County Correctional Facility, Donna M. Asure, Rich Cuth, George Kumburis, Jesse Cleare, J. Parker, Overfield, G. Mowry, Norma L. Elmore, E. Devers, Haidle, PrimeCare Medical, Inc., Thomas, William Buffton, Wilson, Christina (Last name unknown), P. Bauer, W. Johnson, C. Rove, Paul S. James, Grace Ramos, John Doe, PSS, John Doe I, John Doe II, John Doe III, John Doe IV and John Doe V
Case Number: 3:2011cv00413
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting 346 Motion for Damages; denying without prejudice 348 Motion for Attorney Fees as follows: 1.Plaintiffs Peter Ponzini and Miryem Barbaros motion for attorneys fees and expenses is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.2.Plaintiffs Peter Ponzini and Miryem Barbaros motion for delay damages is GRANTED. Delay damages in the amount of $466,488.04 will be added to the jurys compensatory damages award. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/30/17 (jam)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/26/16. (ao)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion in Limine; denying 216 Motion in Limine; denying 229 Motion in Limine; denying 231 Motion in Limine. Memorandum previously filed.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/25/2016 (bg)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/24/16. (ao)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER upon consideration of the Monroe County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Monroe County Defendants' Motions (Doc. 127 and Doc. 154) are GRANTED IN P ART AND DENIED IN PART, to wit: a. With respect to Plaintiffs' claims under § 1983: i. The Motions are DENIED as to Monroe County. ii. The Motions are GRANTED as to Defendant Donna Asure. iii. The Motions are GRANTED as to Defendant Gary Ha idle. iv. The Motions are GRANTED as to Defendants Rich Cuth, James Parker, Robert Overfield, Gary Mowery, Norma Elmore, and Erin Devers. b. With respect to Plaintiffs' state law claims for negligence, wrongful death, and survival, the Motions a re GRANTED as to Defendants Monroe County, Donna Asure, Gary Haidle, Rich Cuth, James Parker, Robert Overfield, Gary Mowery, Norma Elmore, and Erin Devers. c. With respect to Plaintiffs' state law claims for intentional infliction of emotional d istress and conspiracy, the Motions are GRANTED as to Defendants Donna Asure, Gary Haidle, Rich Cutll, James Parker, Robert Overfield, Gary Mowery, Norma Elmore, and Erin Devers. 2. The six John Doe Defendants listed in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. 43) are DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/31/15. (jfg)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER in accordance with the Court's Memorandum Opinion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant William Bufflon's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 82) is GRANTED.2. Defendant Bufflon is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as a party to this action.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/14/14. (jfg)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - For the reasons set forth in this Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss will be Denied, but Defendant Jesse Cleare's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings will be Granted. Aseparate Order will follow.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/19/12. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponzini et al v. Monroe County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Ponzini
Represented By: Brian S. Chacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miryem Barbaros
Represented By: Brian S. Chacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M. Asure
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Cuth
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kumburis
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Cleare
Represented By: Michael J. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Parker
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Mowry
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma L. Elmore
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Devers
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haidle
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Represented By: John R. Hill
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Buffton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina (Last name unknown)
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. James
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Ramos
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, PSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?