Walker v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Walker
Defendant: Jerome W. Walsh, Gary L Gordon, Michael Goyne and Dorian Verner
Case Number: 3:2011cv01750
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: William J. Nealon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM - Order to follow. Signed by Honorable William J. Nealon on 5/6/2013. (rm)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 36 Report and Recommendations.; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss; case REMANDED to M.J. Carlson for further proceedings;Signed by Honorable William J. Nealon on 12/07/12. (ep)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (1) The 17 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. (2)Pltf's Objections are OVERRULED. (3) All Claims and Defts except for the claim against Deft Goyne for failing to protect Pltf by assigning him to a top bunk despite his age are DISMISSE D W/PRJUDICE. (4) Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Defts Walsh, Gordon, Varner, Demming, and Kaye as parties to this action. (5) The Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. (6) Clerk is directed to SERVE a copy of the original Complaint on Deft Goyne. (7) This Case is REMANDED to Mag.Judge Carlson for further proceedings; and (8) Any appeal will be deemed frivolous, lacking merit, and not taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable William J. Nealon on 5/3/2012. (rm, )
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 1) Pltf's 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED. (2) Plt's Objections are OVERRULED. (3) Pltf's 2 9 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis are GRANTED. (4)Pltf Shall file an amended complaint w/in 20 days. (5) Case is REMANDED to Mag. Judge Carlson for further proceedings. (6) Any appeal will be deemed frivolous, lacking merit, and not taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable William J. Nealon on 2/1/2012. (rm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome W. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorian Verner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?