Zabresky v. Von Schmeling et al
Plaintiff: Michael F. Zabresky
Defendant: Julianne Von Schmeling, Michael Quinn, Eugene Duffy, James Davis, Kevin J. Kane, Robert McManus and John DOE
Case Number: 3:2012cv00020
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1)the defendants motion for attorneys fees, (Doc. 137), is GRANTED; (2)The plaintiff is ORDERED to reimburse the defendants $50,000 in attorneys fees.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/28/14. (bs)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), ORDER TERMINATING CASE (1) The defendants motion for summary judgment, (Doc. No. 100), is GRANTED;(2) The clerk is to enter judgment in favor of defendants Michael Quinn, Eugene Duffy, Jr., James Davis, Kevin J. Kane, James Biscotto, Robert Austin, Joseph Para, and John Tigue;(3) The clerk is ORDERED to close this case. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/4/14. (bs)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)1.)Defendant von Schmelings motion for summary judgment, (Doc. No. 98), is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the memorandum of this date..2.)Judgment is to be entered in favor of the Defendant von Schmeling. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/9/13. (bs)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM re 61 MOTION to Quash and for a Protective Order filed by Joseph Musto, 72 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Chester Muroski, Clinton Smith - order to followSigned by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/5/13. (bs)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM (order to follow).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/28/13. (bs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zabresky v. Von Schmeling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. Zabresky
Represented By: Joseph G. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julianne Von Schmeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Duffy
Represented By: John G. Dean
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?