Santanna v. Delaware and Hudson Railway Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ermond Santanna
Defendant: Delaware and Hudson Railway Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01240
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)GRANTING pltf's appeal and objectins to the the Clerk of Court's award of dft's bill of costs; The Clerk of Court's judgment/taxation of costs 99 100 are hereby stricken.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 10/6/15. (sm)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)re 50 , dft's jury instruction #19.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 12/5/14. (sm)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING 37 MOTION for Reconsideration,Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/31/14. (sm)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING dft's 20 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts., and 22 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Injuries Sustained Prior to 1991.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/18/14. (sm) (Main Document 34 replaced on 2/18/2014) (sm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santanna v. Delaware and Hudson Railway Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ermond Santanna
Represented By: Gerard J. Martillotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware and Hudson Railway Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?