Botey v. Green et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Botey
Defendant: Robert D. Green, Conwell Corporation and FFE Transportation Services, Inc.
Counterclaim_plaintiff: Conwell Corporation, Robert D. Green and FFE Transportation Services, Inc.
Counterclaim_defendant: Jonathan A. Botey
Case Number: 3:2012cv01520
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER denying 340 Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/14/18 (jam)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow)Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/9/2017. (rm)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER 1. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude the Use of Demonstrative Evidence Showing Plaintiffs Facial Injuries (Doc. 170) is RESERVED UNTIL TIME OF TRIAL. 2. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Improper "Reptile Theory&qu ot; Tactics (Doc. 166) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 3. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff, his Counsel, Witnesses and any Experts 'from Referring to Robert Green as a"Professional Driver" and Further Precluding tho se Individuals from Stating or Inferring that Robert Green or any Commercial Motor Vehicle Driver is Subject to an Increased or Higher Standard of Care (Doc. 176) is GRANTED IN PART AND RESERVED IN PART as follows: a. Defendants' motion to precl ude plaintiff, his counsel, witnesses and any experts from referring to Robert Green as a"professional driver" is GRANTED.b. Defendants' request that Plaintiff's counsel and witnesses be precluded from stating or inferring that Green or any commercial motor vehicle driver is subject to an increased or higher standard of care is RESERVED UNTIL TIME OF TRIAL.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/8/17. (jfg)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER 1. The R&R (Doc. 125) is ADOPTED, for the reasons discussed therein as well as those discussed in this Court's accompanying memorandum opinion. 2.Defendants' Objections (Doc. 126) are OVERRULED. 3. Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 103) is DENIED. 4. A telephone conference to schedule this action for trial shall be held on Tuesday, November 1, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for arranging the call to (570) 207-5750, and all parties should be ready to proceed before the undersigned is contacted. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/27/16. (jfg)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence (Doc. 74) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, to wit: 1. Plaintiffs request that an adverse inference jury instruction be read against Defendants at the time of trial is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs request that Defendants be precluded from arguing in dispositive motions that Plaintiff lacks evidence to prove his corporate negligence claims against Defendants FFE and Conwell based on the documents destroyed is GRANTED in so far as Defendants are precluded from proving the contents of the destroyed documents by other means or argue their contents in dispositive motions or at trial.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/4/16. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botey v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Botey
Represented By: Daniel W. Munley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Green
Represented By: David Ronald Chludzinski
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwell Corporation
Represented By: David Ronald Chludzinski
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFE Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Ronald Chludzinski
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counterclaim_plaintiff: Conwell Corporation
Represented By: David Ronald Chludzinski
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counterclaim_plaintiff: Robert D. Green
Represented By: David Ronald Chludzinski
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counterclaim_plaintiff: FFE Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Ronald Chludzinski
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counterclaim_defendant: Jonathan A. Botey
Represented By: Daniel W. Munley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?