Doe v. Old Forge Borough et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, -
Defendant: Old Forge Borough, Old Forge Police Department, Old Forge Fire Department, Lawrence A. Semenza, James Krenitsky and Walter Chiavacci
Case Number: 3:2012cv02236
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER denying 444 Motion for New Trial.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/11/19 (jam)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER THAT the Motions are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows:1. Evidence of, and reference to, Defendants Semenza, Krenitsky, and Chiavacci's criminal nolle prossed charges are precluded. 2. Evidence of the criminal charges to which Krenitsky and Chiavacci pleaded guilty is not precluded. 3. Evidence of, and reference to, Defendants Krenitsky and Chiavacci's guilty pleas are not precluded. The admission of this evidence is limited to the facts and details specific to the c harges to which Krenitsky and Chiavacci pleaded guilty. 4. Evidence of, and reference to, Krenitsky's suspension and resignation from the Police Department are not precluded.5. Evidence of, and reference to, Semenza's acquittal, jury convic tions and the reversal of his convictions are precluded. 6. The Court defers ruling on the admissibility of evidence of, and reference to, Semenza's guilty plea to harassment. 7. Testimony offered at Semenza's criminal trial is excluded fro m the present trial. 8. This Court's ruling on the present motions that evidence of, and reference to, Defendants' nolle prossed charges and Semenza's acquittal and the reversal of his convictions will be precluded is subject to each o f the individual defendants opening the door with respect to that Defendant's nolle prossed charges and, in Semenza's case, his introduction of evidence of his acquittal and those convictions which were overturned. The Court's ruling i s also subject to the exception that if Semenza attempts to use any testimony from his criminal trial, this testimony may open the door to the presentation of evidence that Semenza stood trial for events relating toBurdyn, his acquittal on certain co unts, his conviction on the remaining counts, and evidence that his conviction was reversed on appeal.9. The Court notes that these rulings are all subject to revision upon the presentation of facts or arguments that present a basis for admission other than those advanced by the moving parties.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/26/17. (jfg)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER THAT Defendant's Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows:1. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to Count VII (Childhood Sexual Abuse and Vicarious Liability) is GRANTED. 2. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to Count VIII (Negligence), Count IX (Negligent Supervision), and Count XXII (Punitive Damages) is DENIED. 3.Count X(Premises Liability) of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is consolidated with Count VIII of the Amended Complaint.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/3/16. (jfg)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT Defendants' motions are GRANTED; to wit: a. Count VI (19 U.S.C. §2255(a)) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. b. Defendant Semenza's motion to dismiss (Doc. 126) Counts XI (negligence), XIII (negligence per se), and XIX (negligent intliction of emotional distress) is GRANTED and these Counts are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. c. Defendant Krenitsky's motion to dismiss (Doc. 128) Counts XII (negligence), XIV (negligence per se), and XX (negligent inmction of emotional distress) is GRANTED and these Counts are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/1/15. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Old Forge Borough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, -
Represented By: Arianne Slocum
Represented By: Matthew Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Forge Borough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Forge Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Forge Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence A. Semenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Krenitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Chiavacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?