Moffitt v. Tunkhannock Area School District et al
Plaintiff: Joseph P Moffitt
Defendant: Tunkhannock Area School District and Tunkhannock Area School Distric Board of School Directors
Case Number: 3:2013cv01519
Filed: June 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)the plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees and costs, (Doc. 82), as supplemented by subsequent letters to the court, (Docs. 105, 106, 107, 108), is GRANTED IN PART in the amount of $79,467.03. (See order for details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/20/17. (bs)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 08/15/16. (ep)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) that pltf's motion in limine is GRANTED. (See documents for details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/1/16. (bs)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) the defendants motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 39), is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows:(1) The defendants motion for summary is granted with respect to claims arising in Counts II through VI of the amended complaint;(2) The defendants motion for summary is denied with respect to claims arising in Count I of the amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/3/16. (bs)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/31/13. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffitt v. Tunkhannock Area School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P Moffitt
Represented By: Andrew J. Katsock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunkhannock Area School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunkhannock Area School Distric Board of School Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?