Sapa Extrusions, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sapa Extrusions, Inc.
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG, Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company and Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2013cv02827
Filed: November 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),(1)the motion for partial summary judgment of plaintiff Sapa Extrusions, Inc., (Doc. 181), is DENIED;(2)the motion for summary judgment of defendant Gerling-Konzern Allgemeine Versicherungs -AG, (Doc. 150), is GRANTED;(3)the motion for summary judgment of defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, (Doc. 178), is GRANTED;(4)the motion for summary judgment of defendant Great American Assurance Company, (Doc. 185), is GRANTED;(5)the motio n for summary judgment of defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company, (Doc. 187), is GRANTED;(6)the joint motion for summary judgment of defendants National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. and Insurance Company of the State of Pennsyl vania, (Doc. 191), is GRANTED;(7)the joint motion for summary judgment of defendants Pacific Employers Insurance Company and ACE American Insurance Company, (Doc. 197), is GRANTED; and(8)the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. ORDER TERMINATING CASESigned by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/1/18. (bs)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) Motion to seal documents is DENIED. Gerling must identify only those docs. and portions of docs. that clearly and justifiably fall within this courts 1/11/16 confid. order. (see order for details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/7/16. (bs)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)(1)The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvanias motion, (Doc. 19), is DENIED;(2)National Unions motion is GRANTED IN PART insofar as the plaintiff has failed to plead suffici ent damages to trigger the umbrella policies. In all other respects, National Unions motion is DENIED. Counts 3, 4, 5, 6, and 30 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(3)Gerlings motion, (Doc. 42), is GRANTED. Counts 7, 8, 25, and 26 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(4)The plaintiff is granted leave to amend its complaint by August 15, 2014.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/7/14. (bs)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:(1)The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvanias motion, (Doc. 19), is DENIED;(2)National Unions motion is GRANTED IN PART insofar as the plaintiff has fail ed to plead sufficient damages to trigger the umbrella policies. In all other respects, National Unions motion is DENIED. Counts 3, 4, 5, 6, and 30 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(3)Gerlings motion, (Doc. 42), is GRANTED. Counts 27, 28, and 29 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(4)The plaintiff is granted leave to amend its complaint by August 15, 2014. 42 19 Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/28/14. (bs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sapa Extrusions, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sapa Extrusions, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Pillsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Employers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?