Bailey v. B.S. Quarries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pauline M Bailey
Defendant: B.S. Quarries, Inc., Damascus 535 Quarry and Stone Products, Inc., Damascus 535, TNT I Limited Partnership, TNT Partnership, TNT Partnership of Pennsylvania, TNT Services, Lippmann Milwaukee, Inc., Lippmann Quality Used Equipment, Vira Corporation, Timothy Smith and Thomas Bolles
Case Number: 3:2013cv03006
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Susquehanna
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), GRANTING 378 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Lippmann Dfts and against all other parties.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 09/29/17. (sm)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING B.S. Quarries Dfts' 172 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of the MSHA REport of Investigation Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 6/16/16. (sm)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING b.s. Quarries' Dfts' 162 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Lanesboro Police Report. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 6/14/16. (sm)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),DENYING 149 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative Appellate Certification filed by Damascus 535 Quarry and Stone Products, LLC, Thomas Bolles, Timothy Smith, TNT One Limited Partnership, Damascus 535, B.S. Quarries, Inc..Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 5/2/16. (sm)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), GRANTING pltf's motion re Dfts Bolles and Smith remaining as defendants; GRANTING pltf's motion re employer immunity; GRANTING Dft TNT Services Corp's motion re dismissal ; and DENYING all remaining aspects of both parties motions.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 03/31/16. (sm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. B.S. Quarries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline M Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Pisanchyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.S. Quarries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damascus 535 Quarry and Stone Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damascus 535
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT I Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT Partnership of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippmann Milwaukee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippmann Quality Used Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vira Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bolles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?