Miller v. Price et al
Plaintiff: Jason Miller
Defendant: Paula Price, Pac Mark McConnell, Tavaras and Younsker
Case Number: 3:2014cv00301
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: PT
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1) The Motion for Summary Judgment 65 filed by Defendant Mark McConnell is GRANTED. (2) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendant Mark McConnell and against Plaintiff Jason Miller on the remaining Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim.(3) The Clerk of Court is directed to mark the case as CLOSED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/17/19. (dw)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 49 Defendants' Maxwell and Owens' Motion to Dismiss, denying 57 Defendant PAC McConnell's Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall answer the Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/4/2017 (dw)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Paula Price, Younsker Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/18/16. (jam)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed filed by Jason Miller Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/21/14. (jam)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER:, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1.Mr. Miller has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to provide the Court with the necessary information to effect service on Dr. Tavaras.2.Plaintiffs failure to provide the Court with the requested information may result in the dismissal of this action against Dr. Tavaras pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/7/14. (jam)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jason Miller Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/11/14. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pac Mark McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Younsker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?