Brown v. Mace-Liebson et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Brown
Defendant: Ellen Mace-Liebson and Cynthia Entzel
Case Number: 3:2014cv00623
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)1.Plaintiffs motion to strike Defendant Mace-Liebsons declaration in support of her motion for summary judgment (Doc. 149) is DENIED. 2.Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration of the Courts S eptember 29, 2017, Memorandum and Order, granting summary judgment in favor of Defendant Mace-Liebson and against Plaintiff, (Doc. 151), is DENIED.3.Plaintiffs nunc pro tunc motion to supplement the record (Doc. 155) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/16/18. (bs)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), The motion for summary judgment (Doc. 114), filed on behalf of Defendant, Dr. Ellen Mace-Liebson is GRANTED. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Defendant Mace-Liebson and against the Plaintiff.2.The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.ORDER DISMISSING CASESigned by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/29/17. (bs)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 10/17/2016. (emksec, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 9/29/2016. (emksec, )
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 8/18/16. (ao)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 3/15/2016. (emksec, )
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 10/27/2015. (emksec, )
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Having stayed discovery for these reasons, we will DENY the plaintiffs discovery motions, (Docs. 39 and 44 .), without prejudice to renewal of the motion upon resolution of the pending motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment, and will GRANT the defendants motion to stay. (Doc. 42 .). Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 3, 2015. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Mace-Liebson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Mace-Liebson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?