Montanez v. Tritt et al
Plaintiff: Jose Montanez
Defendant: Ms. Tritt, Hannon and State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2014cv01362
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: CA
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Memorandum previously filed). 1. Defendants' motion (Doc. 81) for summary judgment is GRANTED. Judgment shall be ENTERED in favor of Defendants Hannon and Reed, and against Plaintiff Jose Montanez. 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this action. 3. Any appeal from this Order is DEEMED frivolous and not in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3).Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/20/2017 (bg)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER 1. The motion to appoint counsel, (Doc. 56), is DENIED without prejudice.2. The motion to compel discovery, (Doc. 61), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as discussed in the Court's accompanying Memorandum. a. The motion is GRANTED as t o discovery requests 2, 3, 4, 5, 8, and 9. On or before June 27,2016, Defendants shall provide full and complete responses to Plaintiffs discovery requests 2,3,4,5,8, and 9, subject to the exclusions and limitations explained in the accompanying Memo randum. b. The motion is DENIED as to discovery requests 1, 6, 7, and 10. c. The motion to compel is DENIED as to the interrogatories. d. The request for expenses is DENIED. See FED. R. CIV. P. 37(a)(5)(C). e. The request for an enlargement of time t o complete discovery is GRANTED. All discovery shall be completed by August 26, 2016.3. The motion for certification, (Doc. 52), is DENIED. 4. The motion to stay, (Doc. 57), is DISMISSED as moot.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/26/16. (jfg)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER 1. Defendants' motion (Doc. 25) to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: a. Plaintiffs claims against Superintendent Brenda Tritt are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Superintendent Brenda Tritt as a party to this action. b. The motion to dismiss the claims against Lieutenant Joseph Hannon and Sergeant Reed is DENIED. c. Plaintiffs claims against the Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED. 2. Defendants Hannon and Reed are directed to file a responsive pleading within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/21/15. (jfg)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER 1. Plaintiffs motion for discovery, (Doc. 31), is DEEMED WITHDRAWN for failure to file asupporting brief. See M.D. Pa. Local Rule 7.5. 2.Plaintiffs motion to file asecond amended complaint, (Doc. 32), is DEEMED WITHDRAWN for failure to file a s upporting brief. See M.D. Pa. Local Rule 7.5.3. Defendants' motion to stay discovery, (Doc. 34), is GRANTED. All discovery in this matter is stayed pending resolution of Defendants' pending motion to dismiss.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/2/15. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montanez v. Tritt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Tritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?