Semon et al v. Maps Indeed, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P. Semon, Linda Leever and William Jacot
Defendant: Maps Indeed, Inc., Victor Deanthony, Jeffrey DeAnthony, Insequence, Inc. and James Filla
Case Number: 3:2014cv01593
Filed: August 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) The plaintiffs motion for entry of default judgment and motion to liquidate damages, (Doc. 160), against defendant Maps Indeed, Inc., is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/6/19. (bs)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), InSequences motion to dismiss VDs cross-claims against it for failure to state a claim, (Doc. 102), is GRANTED, and VDs cross-claims for indemnification, (Doc. 93 at 4-11), are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/19/19. (bs)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 116 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 2/8/2017 (emksec, )
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 3/11/2016. (emksec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semon et al v. Maps Indeed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P. Semon
Represented By: Lawrence J. Moran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Leever
Represented By: Lawrence J. Moran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jacot
Represented By: Lawrence J. Moran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maps Indeed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Deanthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey DeAnthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insequence, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Filla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?