Fagal v. Marywood University
Plaintiff: Frederick F Fagal, Jr.
Defendant: Marywood University
Case Number: 3:2014cv02404
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1) Judgment is ENTERED in FAVOR of Defendant Marywood University and AGAINST Plaintiff Frederick F. Fagal, Jr. (2) Post-trial motions are to be filed in accordance with the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with the time for filing to be calculated from the date of entry of this Order.(3) The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/27/18. (dw)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/11/17. (dw)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marywood University. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/16/15. (jam)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Frederick F. Fagal is given leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days from the date of entry of this order. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the action will be dismissed. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/8/15. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fagal v. Marywood University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick F Fagal, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marywood University
Represented By: Stephanie Jill Peet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?