Crestwood Membranes, Inc. v. Constant Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Crestwood Membranes, Inc.
Defendant: Constant Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00537
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER DENYING PART and DISMISSING AS MOOT IN PART 147 Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Hybrid Witnesses. To the extent that the Motion seeks to preclude Plaintiff from calling Allan MacKinlay as an expert witness, Defendant's M otion is DENIED. To the extent that the Motion seeks to preclude Plaintiff from calling Bryan Burgess, Steven McEntee, Bob Buffalino, and David Kostewski as expert witnesses, Defendant's Motion is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/23/18 (jam)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denying without prejudice 139 Motion in Limine to Preclude Portions of Plainitff's Expert Report. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/19/18 (jam)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's Motion for an Adverse Inference Instruction (DOC. 54) is DENIED. With respect to Plaintiff's arguments concerning spoliation, however, such denied will be WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's right to renew its Motion at trial subject to proof of the elements necessary to show spoliation.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/9/18. (jam)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) (PLEASE SEE MEMORANDUM FOR COMPLETE DETAILS AND A SEPARATE ORDER FOLLOWS)Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/4/18. (lh)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint, (Doc. 120) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint, previously filed as an attachment to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint, (Doc. 120-2) within 5 days of the date of this Order. All deadlines established by this Court's pretrial scheduling order, (Doc. 113), REMAIN IN EFFECT and shall only be altered for extremely good cause shown. (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/30/17. (lh)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, (Doc. 110), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's Motion is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/1/17. (jfg)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER 1. The Report & Recommendation ("R&R"), (Doc. 96), is ADOPTED IN PART as explained in the Court's accompanying Opinion and for the reasons discussed therein. 2. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 56), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: a. Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint, (Doc. 1), for breach of warranty. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment IN FAVOR of the Defendant and AGAINS T the Plaintiff on this claim. b. In all other respects, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. 3. A telephone scheduling conference will be held on Tuesday, April 4, 2017, at 3:45 p.m. to schedule this case for trial. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for arranging the call to (570) 207-5750, and all parties should be ready to proceed before the undersigned is contacted. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/22/17. (jfg)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER upon consideration of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11), Defendant's Brief in Support thereof (Doc. 13), and Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's Motion (Doc. 11) is DENIED in its entirety.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/17/16. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crestwood Membranes, Inc. v. Constant Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestwood Membranes, Inc.
Represented By: Neil H Koslowe
Represented By: Robert D. Schaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constant Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?