Njos v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Scott J. Njos
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv00931
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: LQ
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The R&R (Doc. 113) is ADOPTED for the reasons discussed therein. 2. Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 103) is GRANTED. Judgment is entered IN FAVOR OF Defendant United States of America and AGAINST Plaintiff Scott Njos. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case..Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/17/18. (jam)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Rescind (Doc. 8) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Discovery (Doc. 83) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/31/17. (ga)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - Plaintiff's Status Report is construed as a motion for a sixty (60) day stay (Doc. 76) and GRANTED. This case is stayed for a period of sixty (6) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall notify the court immediately when he receives his legal propery in this matter. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel (Doc 77) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 2/8/17 (ga)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and enlarge Discovery deadlines; denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify; denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; and, denying as moot 33 Plaintiffs motion to take written depositions. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 2/1/2017 (emksec, )
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 3/10/2016. (emksec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Njos v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Njos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?