Richardson v. Prisoner Transport Services of America et al
Plaintiff: Darren Richardson
Defendant: Prisoner Transport Services of America, Craig A. Lowe, Jonathan J. Romance, Robert E. McLaughlin, Pike County Correctional Facility, Richard Caridi, Matthew M Osterberg, Karl Wagner and Pike County Commissioners
Case Number: 3:2015cv01061
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). 155 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative, to Amend the Judgment filed by Defendant Prisoner Transport Services of America is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/4/19. (dw)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Defendant Prisoner Transport Services of America's Motion for Approval of Security Under Rule 62 for Stay of Execution on Judgment 171 is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/27/19. (dw)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 96 . Defendant, Pike County's Motion for Summary Judgment 81 is GRANTED. Case placed on October, 2018 trial list. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/14/18. (dw)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)DENYING Doc. 51 request for an independent psychiatric examination. See Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/9/17. (ms)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11) granted in part and denied in part. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/17/15. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Prisoner Transport Services of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Richardson
Represented By: James J. Conaboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transport Services of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig A. Lowe
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan J. Romance
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. McLaughlin
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Caridi
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M Osterberg
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Wagner
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County Commissioners
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?