Slate Bar & Lounge In v. Founders Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Slate Bar & Lounge In
Defendant: Founders Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv02251
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry).In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1.The defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 31) is DENIED;2.The plaintiffs motion for judgment on t he pleadings (Doc. 30) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;3.The plaintiffs claim for declaratory relief with respect to the defendants duty to indemnify the plaintiff is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature and unripe; and4.The Clerk is direct ed to enter JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff with respect to the defendants duty to defend the plaintiff in the underlying state court action and to mark this case CLOSED. Said judgment shall include the requested declaration that defendant Founder s Insurance Company has a duty under Policy Number LLPA000967 to provide a defense, or costs of defense, to or for plaintiff Slate Bar & Lounge, Inc., d/b/a Slate Bar & Lounge with respect to the underlying civil action styled Bruce H. Fine v. Slate Bar and Lounge, Inc. t/a Slate Bar and Lounge, Case No. 2076 of 2013, filed in the Court of Common Pleas for Luzerne County, Pennsylvania, on February 19, 2013.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/18/17. (ms)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Doc. 20 Motion for Reconsideration. (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/9/17. (ms)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Founders Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/8/16. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slate Bar & Lounge In v. Founders Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slate Bar & Lounge In
Represented By: James A. Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Founders Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth M. Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?