Canfield v. Statoil USA Onshore Properties INC et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl B. Canfield
Defendant: Statoil USA Onshore Properties INC, Statoil Natural Gas LLC and Statoil ASA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00085
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), (1)Intervenors motion to stay, (Doc. 155), is DENIED. 155 .Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/4/20. (bs)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)motion for preliminary approval of the parties settlement agreement and appointment of class representatives and class counsel, (Doc. 101), is GRANTED. (See order for details and deadlines).Final Approval Hearing set for 10/16/2020 10:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/8/20. (bs)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) that pltf's mot. for reconsideration is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/12/17. (bs)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), (1)All claims against Statoil ASA are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as the court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over those claims and lacks personal jurisdiction over Statoil ASA;(2)The plai ntiffs first, second, third, fifth, and sixth claims for relief against Statoil USA Onshore Properties Inc. stated in the plaintiffs complaint, (Doc. 1), are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and(3)The plaintiffs remaining claims against Statoil USA Onshore Properties Inc. shall proceed as indicated by the courts accompanying memorandum. Statoil ASA and Statoil Natural Gas LLC terminated.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/22/17. (bs)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)the plaintiffs motion for leave to file a sur-reply, (Doc. 56), is DENIED and the plaintiffs proposed sur-reply, (Id., Ex. A), is STRICKEN from the record.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/27/16. (bs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canfield v. Statoil USA Onshore Properties INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl B. Canfield
Represented By: Douglas A. Clark
Represented By: John F. Harnes
Represented By: Francis P. Karam
Represented By: Gerard M. Karam
Represented By: Gregory E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil USA Onshore Properties INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil Natural Gas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?