UGI Sunbury LLC v A Permanent Easement
Plaintiff: UGI Sunbury LLC
Defendant: A Permanent Easement, Zdenek A. Tusek, Alena M. Tusek and All Unknown Owners
Case Number: 3:2016cv00790
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Snyder
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to exclude 59 is denied; Defendant's motion to exclude 63 is denied; Defendant's motion to exxclude 65 is denied; Resolution of Defendant's motion to apply state law 61 is stayed. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/24/18. (lg)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 30 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Zdenek A. Tusek, Alena M. Tusek.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/7/2016. (ch1)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER (MEMORANDUM filed previously as separate docket entry) - Plaintiff's 15 MOTION for Hearing is DENIED. Plaintiff's 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall post a surety bond w/the Clerk of Court in the amount of $97,290.00 payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court" and sent to the U.S. Courthouse & Federal Bldg., Williamsport. The surety bond will be held in the vault located in the Clerk's Office - MDPA - Williamsport Division. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/2/16. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UGI Sunbury LLC v A Permanent Easement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UGI Sunbury LLC
Represented By: Paige F. Macdonald-Matthes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Permanent Easement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zdenek A. Tusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alena M. Tusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?