Martin v. Secretary of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Tyrone Martin
Defendant: Secretary of Corrections, Kevin Kauffman, Timothy Myers, Ryan Kanagy, Brent Dickson, Bradd Fazenbaker, Samuel Bickel, Kevin Barger, John Neumann, Susan Gaff, Matthew Morrison, Melissa Ross, William Dreibelbis and Correct Care Solution
Case Number: 3:2016cv02060
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Referring Judge: LQ
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Claims against Deft. Correct Care Solutions, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend within 20 days. IF Plaintiff fails to amend, Clerk of Court will be directed to terminate Deft. Correct Care Colusions LLC as a party to this action. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/14/17 (jam)
September 5, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All claims against Defendant Melissa Ross are DISMISSED. Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Melissa Ross as a party to this action. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/5/17 (jam)
August 31, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/30/17 (jam)
November 30, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Plaintiff's motion to correct the spelling of Defendant Dreibelbis' name and to add the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections as a defendant ( Doc. 10) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the spelling of Defendant Dreibelbis' last name has been corrected on the docket. Plaintiff;s request to add the Department of Corrections as a defendant is DENIED. Plaintiff's second motion for the appointment of counsel (doc. 13) is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to return the exhibits attached to the motion to Plaintiff. (Doc. 13 at 3-7).) (See Order for complete details).Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 11/30/16. (ga)
November 9, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 11/9/2016. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Secretary of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Kanagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradd Fazenbaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Gaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dreibelbis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?