Beuezza v Duffy
Plaintiff: Nicholas F. Beuezza
Defendant: Terrance Duffy
Case Number: 3:2017cv01884
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Conaboy
Presiding Judge: Susan E. Schwab
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry); ORDER adopting 42 Report and Recommendations for the reasons set forth therein and in this Court's accompanying memorandum opinion. Defendant's Motion to Strike (Doc. 46) is D ENIED. Plaintiff's "Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Letter Filed and Dated on 10/23/2019(Doc. 48) is DENIED. Plaintiff's second Amended Complaint 9Doc. 40) is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Clerk of Court directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/9/20. (jam)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Terrance Duffy is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 24) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. As the Plaintiff submitted a Second Amended Complaint on 8/23/19, the Court deems the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 40) to have been filed. The case is REMANDED to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for further proceedings consistent with this Order. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/23/19. (jam)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The R&R (Doc. 22) is ADOPTED for the reasons set forth therein. Defendant's Objections (Doc. 23) are OVERRULED. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 16) is GRANTED. Pl aintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. As Plaintiff submitted an Amended Complaint on 2/7/19, the Court deems the Amended Complaint (Doc. 24) to have been filed. The case is REMANDED to Magistrate Judge Schwab for further proceedings consistent with this Order. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/14/19. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beuezza v Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas F. Beuezza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?