Reed v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Reed
Defendant: William Williams, Jeffery Rackovan, Nicki Paul, Diana Simpson, Somerset Hospital, Valerie Senko and Julie Kotay
Case Number: 3:2018cv00377
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Centre
Presiding Judge: PT
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), ORDER TERMINATING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 37 Commonwealth's Motion to Dismissed is granted; 38 Medical Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted; 40 Somerset Defend ants' Motion to Dismiss is granted; Clerk directed to close this case; any appeal from this Order will be deemed frivolous, lacking merit, and not taken in good faith. (See order for further/complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/21/2020. (case closed)(lg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER withdrawing 23 Motion to Stay due to failure to file a supporting brief; Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 05/23/19 (ep)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). 13 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/9/19. (dw)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry).1. Mr. Reeds Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) is dismisseddue to its failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8.2. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Mr.Reed shall file a second amended complaint.3. The second amended complaint shall contain the same casenumber presently assigned to this action, and shall be direct,concise, and shall standalone without any reference to anydocument filed in this matter. See Fed. R. Civ . P. 8 (d).4. Should Plaintiff fail to file a timely second amendedcomplaint, the Clerk of Court shall be directed to close thecase pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii).5. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff two (2) copies ofthis Courts prisoner civil-rights complaint form which Mr.Reed shall use in preparing his amended complaint.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/29/2019. (bg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Rackovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicki Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somerset Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Senko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Kotay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?