Doe 1 et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01513
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 11/1/2018 10:45 AM. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. See Order for full details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/12/18. (jam)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Kerns, Kathleen)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of of Compliance by Jane Doe . (Mulcahey, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Mulcahey, John)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/2/18. (jam)
July 31, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Mariani (jw)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Kerns, Kathleen)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Certificate of Service)(Kerns, Kathleen)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holding Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (lh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT C - Part 1 by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Part 2)(lh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 EXHIBIT B by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (lh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (lh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4500233), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen K. Kerns
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John M. Mulcahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: John M. Mulcahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: John M. Mulcahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?