King et al v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristen King, Nicholas King and Joan King
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Co. and The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01549
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Joan King, Kristen King, Nicholas King. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Kaspszyk, Michael)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing pltf to file br/opp re motion tod dismss w/i 10 days of the order ; otherwise the Court will deem the motion as unopposed.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 8/31/18. (sm)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Co..(Foland, Brooks)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Foland, Brooks)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 8/9/18. (sm)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Co.. (Foland, Brooks)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Indemnity Co., The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc. from Monroe County Common Pleas, case number 2018-04925. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4505337), filed by The Travelers Indemnity Co., The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)(rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen King
Represented By: Michael B Kaspszyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas King
Represented By: Michael B Kaspszyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan King
Represented By: Michael B Kaspszyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Allison L Krupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Allison L Krupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Allison L Krupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?