Pierce Broadband, LLC v. Vigilant Infrastructure LLC
Plaintiff: Pierce Broadband, LLC
Defendant: Vigilant Infrastructure LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01733
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Its Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Vigilant Infrastructure LLC.(Kelley, Michael)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re Docket Annotation, #5 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss filed by Vigilant Infrastructure LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Kelley, Michael)
October 19, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 6 deleted - Motion to amend or stay - Document is entitled AFFIDAVIT - should be docketed as an affidavit - not a motion. Tried to call counsel - did not get a response. Counsel should refile as an affidavit. (bs)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay by Vigilant Infrastructure LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits for Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Michael) Modified on 10/9/2018 (bs).
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pierce Broadband, LLC. Vigilant Infrastructure LLC served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Boynton, Alan)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/7/18. (bs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Vigilant Infrastructure LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vigilant Infrastructure LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4532208), filed by Pierce Broadband, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce Broadband, LLC v. Vigilant Infrastructure LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigilant Infrastructure LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierce Broadband, LLC
Represented By: Alan R. Boynton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?