MPW Industrial Services, Inc. et al v. DeFazio et al

Plaintiff: MPW Transportation Services, LLC, MPW Industrial Services, Inc. and MPW Equipment Leasing, LLC
Defendant: Charles DeFazio and Stephen C. DeFazio
Case Number: 3:2018cv01809
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MPW Industrial Services, Inc., MPW Equipment Leasing, LLC, MPW Transportation Services, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
September 19, 2018 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by MPW Equipment Leasing, LLC, MPW Industrial Services, Inc., MPW Transportation Services, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
September 17, 2018 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/17/18. (jam)
September 17, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MPW Industrial Services, Inc., MPW Equipment Leasing, LLC, MPW Transportation Services, LLC. Charles DeFazio served on 9/15/2018, answer due 11/14/2018; Stephen C. DeFazio served on 9/15/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Tuite, Jaime)
September 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Charles DeFazio, Stephen C. DeFazio and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Charles DeFazio, Stephen C. DeFazio ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4542741), filed by MPW Industrial Services, Inc., MPW Equipment Leasing, LLC, MPW Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MPW Industrial Services, Inc. et al v. DeFazio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPW Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Jaime S. Tuite
Represented By: Jordan M. Webster
Represented By: Bridget J. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPW Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime S. Tuite
Represented By: Jordan M. Webster
Represented By: Bridget J. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPW Equipment Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Jaime S. Tuite
Represented By: Jordan M. Webster
Represented By: Bridget J. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles DeFazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. DeFazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?