Cardona Reyes v. Doll

Petitioner: Eduardo Antonio Cardona Reyes
Respondent: Clair Doll
Case Number: 3:2018cv01810
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
0 Judge: CA
1 Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 6 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Clair Doll by Clair Doll. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Swauger, Melissa)
September 19, 2018 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Served on Clair Doll, U.S. Atty and U.S. Atty General Wash DC (ep)
September 19, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER : Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on Respondent and the United States Attorney. Respondent shall file within 21 days an answer to the petition (Doc. 1) See Order for full details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/19/18. (jam)
September 18, 2018 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (rm)
September 17, 2018 Receipt of payment from EDUARDO ANTONIO CARDONA REYES in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 9/14/2018. Receipt number 333062282 processed by lhannick. (jjs, )
September 14, 2018 2 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (rm)
September 14, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333 062282), filed by Petr Eduardo Antonio Cardona Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardona Reyes v. Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eduardo Antonio Cardona Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clair Doll
Represented By: Kate Mershimer
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?