Guard v. Sherwood Freightliner et al

Plaintiff: Rose Marie Guard
Defendant: Sterling & Western Star, Inc. and Sherwood Freightliner
Case Number: 3:2018cv01890
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Sherwood Freightliner, Sterling & Western Star, Inc.. (LAWLESS, SUSAN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sherwood Freightliner, Sterling & Western Star, Inc..(LAWLESS, SUSAN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by SUSAN A LAWLESS on behalf of Sherwood Freightliner, Sterling & Western Star, Inc. Attorney Susan A. Lawless is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4595415.. (LAWLESS, SUSAN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Rose Marie Guard. All Defendants. (Borland, Kimberly)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 10/10/18. (sm)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
September 26, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Munley (jw)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherwood Freightliner, Sterling & Western Star, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4553581), filed by Rose Marie Guard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guard v. Sherwood Freightliner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Guard
Represented By: Kimberly D. Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling & Western Star, Inc.
Represented By: SUSAN A LAWLESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Freightliner
Represented By: SUSAN A LAWLESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?