Federal National Mortgage Association et al v. Boldrini
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association and PROF-2013-S3 Title Trust II
Defendant: Antonello Boldrini
Case Number: 3:2018cv01959
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 Filing 31 APPENDIX A by Antonello Boldrini. to #29 Notice of Appeal,. (ep)
November 20, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER PRO SE Case as to #9 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings, by Antonello Boldrini. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 505 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ep) Modified on 11/21/2018 (cl).
November 14, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #23 MOTION to Strike #16 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 14, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Objection to Doc. #18 Report and Recommendations by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Brief in Support of Doc. #13 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Brief in Support of Doc. #11 Amended Notice of Removal by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike as untimely #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, #12 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Antonello Boldrini by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 9, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #16 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance by Antonello Boldrini.(ep) Modified on 11/13/2018 (ep).
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga) (ga).
November 7, 2018 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Antonello Boldrini re #10 Objections to Magistrate Judge Carlson's #3 Order. (ao)
November 6, 2018 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BOLDRINI'S ANSWERS WITH NEW MATTER & COUNTERCLAIMS TO ATTORNEY SCHULER'S MOTION FOR REMAND (Doc.8) by Antonello Boldrini. C.of S. #19 Document Filed. (kc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWERS WITH NEW MATTER & COUNTERCLAIMS TO ATTORNEY SCHULER'S MOTION FOR REMAND (Doc.8) by Antonello Boldrini. #8 MOTION to Remand. C. of S. . (kc) Modified on 11/7/2018 (kc).
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs motion to remand (Doc. #8 ) be GRANTED, and Boldrinis motion to strike (Doc. #12 ), be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 6, 2018. (kjn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Association of Entry of Appearance (Phillips, Eric)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Phillips on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Phillips, Eric)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 Brief in Support by Antonello Boldrini. #14 Request for Service by U.S. Marshal. (ep)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST for service by U.S. Marshal by Antonello Boldrini. (ep)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 OBJECTIONS by Antonello Boldrini. to #9 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings,. (ep)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 Amended #1 Notice of Removal filed by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Part II, #2 Defendant List)(bg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS by Antonello Boldrini. to #3 Order Granting Application to Proceed IFP,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Deadlines,,. (ep)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #8 MOTION to Remand . IS ORDERED as follows: Boldrini shall file a response to the motion on or before November 6, 2018. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.7 the movant may then file a reply briefs on or before November 20, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 23, 2018. (kjn)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Schuler, Lauren)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST for Correct the caption and cause of the case by Antonello Boldrini. (ep)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini re #1 Notice of Removal (ep)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Praecipe to file state case attorneys information. (ep)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Praecipe to file new matter 10-05-2018 filed at the count court. (Attachments: #1 continued)(ep)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order - We will provisionally GRANT this motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, but IT IS ORDERED that a copy of this filing be served upon counsel for the plaintiff in the underlying state court action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the state court plaintiff believes that this Notice of Removal is procedurally or substantively flawed, it will file a motion to dismiss or remand this action to state court on or before October 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 10, 2018. (kjn)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Antonello Boldrini from Luzerne County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016-3597. ( Filing fee $ 400 ), filed by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association et al v. Boldrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonello Boldrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Lauren L. Schuler
Represented By: Eric J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROF-2013-S3 Title Trust II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?