Castillo v. Ebbert

Petitioner: Charles Henry Castillo
Respondent: Warden David Ebbert
Case Number: 3:2018cv01979
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
0 Judge: Robert D Mariani
1 Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Order to Show Cause RECEIVED from U.S. Attorney's Office. (ktt)
December 7, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The respondent shall show cause on or before December 28, 2018 why the petitioner should not be granted habeas corpus relief; SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/7/2018. (ktt)
November 14, 2018 Receipt of payment from CHARLES CASTILLO in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 11/13/2018. Receipt number 333063092 processed by lhannick. (jjs, )
November 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: With the payment in full of the filing fee, this case is DEEMED FILED; (ep)
November 14, 2018 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 63092 (ep)
November 7, 2018 5 Letter/REQUEST by Charles Henry Castillo for copies of his petition and everything else he filed in this case-and requests that the copies be for free. (cl)
October 16, 2018 4 Thirty (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) Modified on 10/16/2018 (lp).
October 12, 2018 3 PRO SE LETTER issued (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent Form)(ep)
October 12, 2018 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Henry Castillo re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (ep)
October 12, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Charles Henry Castillo.(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Ebbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Henry Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden David Ebbert
Represented By: Kate Mershimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?