Dunne et al v. Environmental Construction Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lori Eshenaur and Donald Dunne
Defendant: Environmental Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02153
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Dunne, Lori Eshenaur re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default (Johnston, Charles)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Environmental Construction Services, Inc.Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/4/19. (bs)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Dunne, Lori Eshenaur re #6 Order,, #5 Request for Entry of Default (Johnston, Charles)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Presently before the court is the plaintiffs request for entry of default as to the above listed defendant. Attached to the request is an affidavit in support of the request. There does not appear to be a Certificate of Service filed indicating that a copy of the request and affidavit were served upon the defendant.Within seven (7) days from the date of this order, the plaintiff shall file a certificate of service indicating that defendant was properly served with the plaintiffs request.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/4/19. (bs)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Donald Dunne, Lori Eshenaur. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Charles)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dunne, Lori Eshenaur. Environmental Construction Services, Inc. served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Johnston, Charles)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/30/18. (bs)
November 7, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case is assigned to Judge Mannion (jw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Environmental Construction Services, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Environmental Construction Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4593419), filed by Lori Eshenaur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2018) (ao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunne et al v. Environmental Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Eshenaur
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dunne
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?