MENDEZ v. WEIS SUPERMARKET

Plaintiff: RITA MENDEZ
Defendant: WEIS SUPERMARKET
Case Number: 3:2018cv02165
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
0 Judge: Malachy E Mannion
1 Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 8 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lh)
November 9, 2018 7 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 AO 398, 399 forms)(lh)
November 9, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ORIGINAL IFP FORM FILED IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA ON 11/5/18) by RITA MENDEZ.(lh)
November 9, 2018 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-04790 containing 1-4 electronic documents and docket sheet received. (lh)
November 7, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/7/18. 11/7/18 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO MENDEZ. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 5, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RITA MENDEZ. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 5, 2018 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 5, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against WEIS SUPERMARKET, filed by RITA MENDEZ.(ahf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2018: #1 Envelope) (ahf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 5, 2018 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY RITA MENDEZ.(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDEZ v. WEIS SUPERMARKET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIS SUPERMARKET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?