Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group

Plaintiff: Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group
Case Number: 3:2018cv02270
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police.(Mey, Michael)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before January 4, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an opposition brief, the Court may grant the motion without a merits analysis.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/20/18. (dw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(McDonnell, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group from Luzerne County, case number 2018-cv-2707. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4608200), filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group
Represented By: Amy Blumenthal
Represented By: Michael T. McDonnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police
Represented By: Michael R. Mey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?