The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10 v. Morris et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10
Defendant: The United States of America and Corah A. Morris
Case Number: 3:2018cv02279
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. The United States of America served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Hladik, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. The United States of America served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Hladik, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. Corah A. Morris served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Hladik, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Atty Hladik advised that in order that ECF may create and satisfy automatically-generated Service and Answer deadlines, Docs. #4 , #5 and #6 in the above-captioned case should be re-filed using the proper event, "Summons Returned Executed" found in the category, "Service of Process" under the heading, "Initial Pleadings and Service". (ep)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corah Morris on 12/14/2018, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. (Hladik, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on USA c/o US Attorney's Office on 12/11/2018, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. (Hladik, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on USA c/o Department of Justice on 12/07/2018, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. (Hladik, Stephen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. (Hladik, Stephen)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Corah A. Morris, The United States of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corah A. Morris, The United States of America ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4609560), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10 v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York as Trustee for CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-10
Represented By: Stephen M. Hladik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corah A. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?