AnimalScan, LLC v. Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC et al

Plaintiff: AnimalScan, LLC
Defendant: Covert Aire, LLC, Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC and Michael Covert
Case Number: 3:2018cv02288
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Malachy E Mannion
1 Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Winter, Cory)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Compliance and Certificate of Service filed by AnimalScan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Campenni, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Br. in oppos. re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Brief in Opposition due by 1/16/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/28/18 (bs)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/26/18. (bs)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (In Opposition) filed by AnimalScan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campenni, Thomas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC re #7 Brief in Support (Word Count Certificate). (Winter, Cory)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-G)(Winter, Cory)
December 10, 2018 VERBAL ORDER - Case Reassigned to Honorable Malachy E Mannion. Honorable Robert D. Mariani no longer assigned to the case. (kc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winter, Cory)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Vinsko, Jr on behalf of Michael Covert, Covert Aire, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vinsko, William)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/30/18. (jam)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC. (Winter, Cory)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (ao)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 8469 of 2016. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4611392), filed by Jason King, Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AnimalScan, LLC v. Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covert Aire, LLC
Represented By: William E. Vinsko, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason King
Represented By: Cory S. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Oak Veterinary Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Cory S. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Covert
Represented By: William E. Vinsko, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AnimalScan, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Campenni
Represented By: Robert L. Gawlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?