Christian et al v. Progressive Advanced Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Paula M Christian and Wayne Christian
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02301
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Paula M Christian, Wayne Christian by Paula M Christian, Wayne Christian.(Cefalo, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for State Complaint served on Progressive Advanced Insurance on 12/04/2018, filed by Paula M Christian, Wayne Christian. (Cefalo, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company.(Parrish, G.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/3/18. (jam)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company from Court of Common of Lackawanna County, case number 18-cv-5982. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4612774ss), filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian et al v. Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula M Christian
Represented By: Michael J. Cefalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Christian
Represented By: Michael J. Cefalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By: G. Christopher Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?