Muldrow v. Walmart Stores East, LP

Plaintiff: Deitra Muldrow
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv02327
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Deitra Muldrow. Walmart Stores East, LP waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Chivers, Joseph)
December 19, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Chivers on behalf of Deitra Muldrow (Chivers, Joseph)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/6/18. (bs)
December 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores East, LP and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4616583), filed by Deitra Muldrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg) Modified on 12/6/2018 (bg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muldrow v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deitra Muldrow
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Joseph H. Chivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?