United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC et al v. CJ Hughes Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: . Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Apprenticeship & Traning Fund, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC, Trustee Joseph M. Padavan, . Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund, Joseph M. Padavan and Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund
Defendant: CJ Hughes Construction, Inc. and Contractors Rental Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02406
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting #8 deft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CJ Hughes Construction, Inc. answer due 2/25/2019; Contractors Rental Corporation answer due 2/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/28/19 (bs)
January 24, 2019 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CJ Hughes Construction, Inc., Contractors Rental Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Binotto, Phillip)
January 24, 2019 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Contractors Rental Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CJ Hughes Construction Company for Contractors Rental Corporation. (Binotto, Phillip)
January 24, 2019 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CJ Hughes Construction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Services of America Corporation for CJ Hughes Construction, Inc.. (Binotto, Phillip)
January 24, 2019 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J Binotto, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Binotto, Phillip)
January 8, 2019 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Apprenticeship & Traning Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund, Joseph M. Padavan. Contractors Rental Corporation served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Botta, Nicholas)
January 8, 2019 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Apprenticeship & Traning Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund, Joseph M. Padavan. CJ Hughes Construction, Inc. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Botta, Nicholas)
December 20, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
December 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4629833), filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Apprenticeship & Traning Fund,. Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund, Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund, Joseph M. Padavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC et al v. CJ Hughes Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Hughes Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractors Rental Corporation
Represented By: Phillip J Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: . Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Apprenticeship & Traning Fund
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers Internationa Union AFL-CIO-CLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Joseph M. Padavan
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: . Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Pension Fund
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Padavan
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Heavy & Highway Contractors Welfare Fund
Represented By: Nicholas J. Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?